Case: A-11777
A-11777
11/25/1966
Application for Writ of Error
KNOX L. GARVIN
CLIFFORD R. GOLDSMITH, SOUTHWESTERN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY AND VALLEY ROYALTY CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/13/1967 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
02/02/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
12/12/1966 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
11/25/1966 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
11/25/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/14/1967 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
02/13/1967 | Motion to Strike filed | Overruled | | |
02/13/1967 | Reply to Response | | ||
02/09/1967 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
02/08/1967 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
02/02/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
12/12/1966 | Response to Petition | | ||
11/25/1966 | Response to Petition | | ||
11/25/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
11/25/1966 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Southwestern Life Insurance Company and Valley Royalty Corporation | Respondent | |
Clifford R. Goldsmith | Respondent | |
Knox L. Garvin | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information