judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LIONEL BERNARD LOWDEN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-0748
Short Caption:LIONEL BERNARD LOWDEN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD24419-09Filed Date:06/09/2010

Opening Event Date:06/09/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/18/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/18/2010
Argued/Submitted:03/01/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/22/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLionel Bernard Lowden Y
Holly D. Reed YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/09/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/28/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Holly D. Reed, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (GP)
06/28/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Holly D. Reed, Esquire
07/02/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
08/18/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (5pgs/Tape) 12/9/09 proc.
08/18/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (12pgs/Tape) 3/22/10 proc.
08/18/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (60pgs/Maddox) 6/7/10 proc. w/CD included
08/18/2010RECORD COMPLETED
08/23/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
08/26/2010RECORD INDEX
08/26/2010RECORD COPIES
09/13/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF w/ appendix attached
09/13/2010APPENDIX
10/18/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
10/18/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
11/09/2010FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
02/02/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
02/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT
02/25/2011ORDER DENYING APLT MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT and this matter will be submitted for decision on March 1, 2011, on the record and briefs filed without argument by any party. (JC)
03/01/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/01/2011SUBMITTED to Judge Ruiz,King,Blackburn-Rigsby
06/30/2011AFFIRMED (MOJ) (Ruiz and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and King, Senior Judge.)
07/22/2011FiledMandate