judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GEORGE L. ARNOLD and GEORGE L. ARNOLD, P.C., a Wyoming Professional Corporation v. KRISTEEN DAY and MARK DAY, wife and husband

Case Heading (06-160)
Case Number:06-160Case Docketed On:07/07/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:GEORGE L. ARNOLD and GEORGE L. ARNOLD, P.C., a Wyoming Professional Corporation v. KRISTEEN DAY and MARK DAY, wife and husband
Full Title:GEORGE L. ARNOLD and GEORGE L. ARNOLD, P.C., a Wyoming Professional Corporation, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. KRISTEEN DAY and MARK DAY, wife and husband, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGeorge L. Arnold, P.C. a Wyoming professional corporationGeorge L. Arnold
V. Anthony Vehar
AppellantGeorge L. ArnoldGeorge L. Arnold
V. Anthony Vehar
AppelleeKristeen DayMark W Harris
AppelleeMark DayMark W Harris

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 86
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/07/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/07/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/07/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/07/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/21/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/21/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/08/2006Brief - AppellantsBriefAppellantFinal
10/23/2006Brief - AppelleesBriefAppelleeFinal
10/27/2006Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/07/2006Brief - Appellants replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/07/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/07/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/20/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, ExhibitsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/20/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/23/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/08/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/08/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/13/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for on 6/11/07.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal