judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GRAFF (RICHARD) VS. STATE C/W 36615

Case Information: 34707
Short Caption:GRAFF (RICHARD) VS. STATE C/W 36615Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:34707*, 36615
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - 5832Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/09/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/23/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07868
10/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-09566
11/09/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 5. Mailed on: UPS-no postmark. 99-11048
11/09/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/22/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. Having reviewed the records on appeal, we conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." fn11[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted. This court received and considered the respondent's answering brief in Docket No. 34707.] Nos. 34707/ 36615. SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-03307
03/19/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40( c). fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB. Nos. 34707/36615. 02-04914
04/03/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-05102
04/03/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/15/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 5, 2002. 02-05102