Case: 03-0226
03-0226
03/05/2003
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
IN THE INTEREST OF S. M. E.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/08/2020 | Brief from database | Refer to file-stamped date on the document for the actual file date. | ||
10/07/2020 | Brief from database | Refer to file-stamped date on the document for the actual file date. | ||
03/05/2003 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | appendix attached | |
03/05/2003 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | on behalf of Lillene Foster (extra copy in control folder) | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/08/2020 | Brief from database | Refer to file-stamped date on the document for the actual file date. | ||
10/07/2020 | Brief from database | Refer to file-stamped date on the document for the actual file date. | ||
06/10/2003 | Case Stored | G02/24-G-2 | | |
06/06/2003 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Order mailed to the court of appeals. | | |
04/17/2003 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
03/18/2003 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
03/14/2003 | Response Waiver filed | On behalf of Texas Department of Protectice & Regulatory Services | | |
03/05/2003 | Appendix Filed | appendix attached | | |
03/05/2003 | Petition for Review | on behalf of Lillene Foster (extra copy in control folder) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
06/10/2003 | Case Stored | Case stored. | G02/24-G-2 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PROTECTIVE | Respondent | Ms Mitzi Turner Ms. Sandra Doris Hachem |
FOSTER, LILLENE | Petitioner | Ms. Patricia Cantu Mr. Jon A. Jaworski |
S. M. E. | Other interested party | Ms. Miriam Judith Riskind |
Court of Appeals Information:
14-02-00350-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
___ SW3d ___, 01-16-03
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
315th District Court
Harris
Honorable E. Kent Ellis
01-01754J