Case: 99-0892
99-0892
09/13/1999
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
CHARLES ANTHONY SMITH a/k/a TONY SMITH
TARRANT COUNTY BAIL BOND BOARD
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/13/1999 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | ON BEHALF OF CHARLES ANTHONY SMITH a/k/a TONY SMITH | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/14/2000 | Case Stored | | | |
03/14/2000 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | to CoA | | |
11/18/1999 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
10/19/1999 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
10/15/1999 | Response Waiver filed | on behalf of Tarrant County | | |
09/13/1999 | Appendix to any instrument | ATTACHED TO PETITION | | |
09/13/1999 | Petition for Review | ON BEHALF OF CHARLES ANTHONY SMITH a/k/a TONY SMITH | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
03/14/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 33-C-4 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Smith, TONY | Petitioner | Mr. Richard Alley |
TARRANT COUNTY BAIL BOND BOARD | Respondent | Mr. Tim Curry Mr. David Keith Hudson |
SMITH, CHARLES ANTHONY | Petitioner | Mr. Richard Alley |
Court of Appeals Information:
02-99-00108-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
___ SW2d ___, 07-29-99
2nd Court of Appeals
Honorable DIXON W. HOLMAN
Trial Court Information
48th District Court
Tarrant
48-170589-97