Case: A-11799
A-11799
12/09/1966
Application for Writ of Error
GRANVILLE C. FARMER
CARRIE LEE SMITH
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/15/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
12/19/1966 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
12/09/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/20/1967 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
02/15/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
01/02/1967 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
12/19/1966 | Motion to dismiss | Filing granted | | |
12/19/1966 | Response to Petition | | ||
12/09/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
12/09/1966 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Carrie Lee Smith | Respondent | |
Granville C. Farmer | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information