judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

TEXAS NATIONAL BANK OF COMMERCE, EXECUTOR, ESTATE OF NETTIE TAYLOR WILLIAMS, DECEASED AND MOLLIE TAYLOR STEVENSON AND HUSBAND, BENJAMIN STEVENSON v. FRANCIS AUGUSTE, ET AL., HOUSTON BANK AND TRUST COMPANY, GUARDIAN OF THE ESTATE OF PINKIE E. TAYLOR, NCM

Case: A-11763
A-11763
11/14/1966
MISC PETITION
TEXAS NATIONAL BANK OF COMMERCE, EXECUTOR, ESTATE OF NETTIE TAYLOR WILLIAMS, DECEASED AND MOLLIE TAYLOR STEVENSON AND HUSBAND, BENJAMIN STEVENSON
FRANCIS AUGUSTE, ET AL., HOUSTON BANK AND TRUST COMPANY, GUARDIAN OF THE ESTATE OF PINKIE E. TAYLOR, NCM
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/29/1966Reply to ResponseRelator
11/19/1966Letter brief Respondent
11/17/1966Response to PetitionRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/29/1966Reply to Response
12/15/1966Response to Motion filed
11/19/1966Letter brief
11/18/1966Response to Motion filed
11/17/1966Response to PetitionFiling granted
11/14/1966Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusOverruled
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Houston Bank and Trust Company, Guardian of the Estate of Pinkie E. Taylor, NCMRespondent
Francis Auguste, et al.Respondent
Texas National Bank of Commerce, Executor, Estate of Nettie Taylor Williams, deceased and Mollie Taylor Stevenson and husband, Benjamin StevensonRelator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information