Case: A-11762
A-11762
11/14/1966
Application for Writ of Error
MICHAEL P. GRACE, II, ET UX.
CHARLES B. ALLEN AND JERRY J. BROWN, DBA ALLEN AND BROWN
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/16/1967 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
01/05/1967 | Response to Brief filed | Respondent | | |
12/19/1966 | Brief in Support of Petition | Petitioner | | |
11/16/1966 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
11/14/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/16/1967 | Reply to Response | | ||
01/05/1967 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
12/19/1966 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
11/22/1966 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
11/21/1966 | Motion to amend application for writ of error | Filing granted | | |
11/16/1966 | Motion to Withdraw Filed | Filing granted | | |
11/16/1966 | Response to Petition | | ||
11/14/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
11/14/1966 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Michael P. Grace, II, et ux. | Petitioner | |
Charles B. Allen and Jerry J. Brown, dba Allen and Brown | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information