Case: A-11785
A-11785
12/01/1966
Application for Writ of Error
NEW AMSTERDAM CASUALTY COMPANY
T.J. BETTES COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/07/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
06/05/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
12/15/1966 | Response to Petition | Petitioner | | |
12/14/1966 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
12/01/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Respondent | | |
12/01/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/07/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
06/05/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
12/15/1966 | Response to Petition | | ||
12/14/1966 | Response to Petition | | ||
12/01/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
12/01/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
12/01/1966 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
New Amsterdam Casualty Company | Petitioner | |
T.J. Bettes Company | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information