Case: B-4448
B-4448
02/01/1974
Application for Writ of Error
MARQUERITE L. ORAM
GENERAL AMERICAN OIL COMPANY OF TEXAS, ET AL., MARVIN R. SMITH, ALMA L. SMITH AND LAWYERS SURETY CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/10/1974 | Notice of Appeal filed | | ||
08/01/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
06/13/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
06/13/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
04/25/1974 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
04/25/1974 | Supplement to Response | Respondent | | |
04/22/1974 | Supplement to Response | Respondent | | |
02/19/1974 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
02/08/1974 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
02/01/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/10/1974 | Notice of Appeal filed | | ||
08/08/1974 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
08/06/1974 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
08/01/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
07/17/1974 | Opinion issued on motion for rehearing | | ||
06/26/1974 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
06/13/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Filing granted | | |
06/13/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | | ||
04/25/1974 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
04/25/1974 | Supplement to Response | | ||
04/22/1974 | Supplement to Response | | ||
02/19/1974 | Response to Petition | | ||
02/08/1974 | Response to Petition | | ||
02/01/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
02/01/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Marvin R. Smith, Alma L. Smith and Lawyers Surety Corporation | Respondent | |
General American Oil Company of Texas, et al. | Respondent | |
Marquerite L. Oram | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information