Case: B-4460
B-4460
02/11/1974
MISC PETITION
STATE OF TEXAS, ET AL.
FRANK B. MCGREGOR
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/05/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Relator | | |
02/26/1974 | Supplemental Brief filed | Respondent | | |
02/21/1974 | Supplement to Petition filed | Relator | | |
02/11/1974 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | Relator | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/11/1974 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
03/05/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
02/26/1974 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
02/21/1974 | Supplement to Petition filed | | ||
02/19/1974 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
02/19/1974 | Motion to Strike filed | | ||
02/19/1974 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
02/11/1974 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | ||
02/11/1974 | Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus | Overruled | | |
02/11/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State of Texas, et al. | Relator | |
Frank B. McGregor | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information