Case: B-4426
B-4426
01/18/1974
Application for Writ of Error
BISCAYNE TEXAS PROPERTIES
OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, ROMELIA MINER
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/21/1974 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
02/15/1974 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
02/04/1974 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
01/18/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/21/1974 | Reply to Response | | ||
02/15/1974 | Response to Petition | | ||
02/04/1974 | Response to Petition | | ||
01/25/1974 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | Filing granted | | |
01/18/1974 | Conditional application for writ of error filed | | ||
01/18/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
01/18/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Romelia Miner | Respondent | |
Biscayne Texas Properties | Petitioner | |
OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information