Case: 03-01-00312-CV
03-01-00312-CV
05/29/2001
Bill of Review
Dr. Rudoulf Michael Metz
Lake LBJ Municipal Utility District; Llano Independent School District; County Education District #15; Linebarger Heard Goggan Blair Graham Pena & Sampson; Llano County; Lake Lyndon B. Johnson Improvement Corporation; et al.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/15/2012 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |||||
01/31/2005 | Case stored | | |||||
02/11/2003 | Mandate Issued | | |||||
11/07/2002 | Motion for remand disposed | Dismissed | | ||||
11/07/2002 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
06/24/2002 | Submitted | | |||||
06/13/2002 | Addedum received | | |||||
05/07/2002 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
05/02/2002 | Oral argument request overruled by Court | | |||||
04/26/2002 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
04/24/2002 | Brief filed | | |||||
04/24/2002 | Oral argument requested | | |||||
04/24/2002 | Record has been checked in-see remarks | | |||||
04/24/2002 | Letter sent to parties from the court. | | |||||
04/22/2002 | Record checked out - see remarks | | |||||
04/17/2002 | Response to Motion | | |||||
04/08/2002 | Miscellaneous motion received | | |||||
04/02/2002 | Affidavit filed | | |||||
04/01/2002 | Brief filed | | |||||
03/29/2002 | Certificate of conference requested | | |||||
03/27/2002 | miscellaneous motion filed | | |||||
03/15/2002 | Order Entered | Ordered |
| ||||
03/15/2002 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
03/05/2002 | Filing fee requested | | |||||
02/28/2002 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
01/08/2002 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
01/07/2002 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
12/20/2001 | Letter sent to parties from the court. | | |||||
12/10/2001 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||||
11/21/2001 | Notice of no Court Reporter's Record Recd or Filed | | |||||
10/31/2001 | Filing fee requested | | |||||
10/30/2001 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
10/11/2001 | Letter received | | |||||
10/02/2001 | Letter sent to parties from the court. | | |||||
08/28/2001 | Response to Motion | | |||||
08/17/2001 | Clerk's Record Overdue | | |||||
08/10/2001 | Letter received | | |||||
07/26/2001 | Letter received | | |||||
07/09/2001 | Miscellaneous motion received | | |||||
07/09/2001 | Response to Motion | | |||||
07/05/2001 | Response to Motion | | |||||
06/27/2001 | Response requested (postcard) | | |||||
06/19/2001 | Staff recommendation for mediation | No for mediation | | ||||
06/18/2001 | Response to Motion | | |||||
06/18/2001 | Docketing statement received | | |||||
06/11/2001 | Filing fee requested | | |||||
06/11/2001 | Completed docketing statement requested | | |||||
05/29/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/11/2003 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Horseshoe Bay Applehead Assessment Association, Inc. | Appellee | Mr. Wade Hutto |
Lake LBJ Municipal Utility District | Appellee | Mr. Brian E. Brown |
County Education District #15 | Appellee | |
Metz, Rudoulph Michael | Appellant | Ms. Betsy Johnson |
Lake Lyndon B. Johnson Impovement Corporation | Appellee | Mr. Wade Hutto |
Llano Independent School District | Appellee | |
Linebarger Heard Goggan Blair Graham Pena & Sampson | Appellee | |
Llano County | Appellee |
Trial Court Information
33rd District Court
Llano
Honorable Guilford L. Jones
12,160