judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

FRED J. DEWITT, ET UX. v. JACQUE O. BROOKS, ET UX.

Case: A-147
A-147
04/19/1944
Application for Writ of Error
FRED J. DEWITT, ET UX.
JACQUE O. BROOKS, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/08/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
08/09/1944Amended motion for rehearingRespondent
07/06/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/29/1944Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
05/24/1944Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
05/24/1944Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
05/03/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
04/19/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/21/1945Order from Lower Court filed
02/06/1945Motion for production of documents filedFiling granted
11/13/1944Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
11/08/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/09/1944Amended motion for rehearingOverruled
07/06/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/29/1944Supplemental Brief filed
05/24/1944Supplemental Brief filed
05/24/1944Supplemental Brief filed
05/06/1944Bond
05/03/1944Response to Petition
05/03/1944Document received (See Remarks)
05/03/1944Document received (See Remarks)
04/19/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/19/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Fred J. DeWitt, et ux.Petitioner
Jacque O. Brooks, et ux.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information