judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RAYMOND E. DODD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-0733
Short Caption:RAYMOND E. DODD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL2698-93Filed Date:06/09/2010

Opening Event Date:06/09/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/08/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/14/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRaymond E. DoddYPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/09/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/29/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on June 9, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
07/08/2010RECORD COPIES
07/08/2010RECORD INDEX
07/08/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/15/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/10/2010 On consideration of this court's order of October 15, 2010, directing appellant to file the brief and limited appendix within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: JAC)
01/14/2011 On consideration of this court's order of December 10, 2010 , which directed appellant to submit the brief and the limited appendix w/n 20 days, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant shall w/n 15 days from the date of this order submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to fi le out of itme. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure iether to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time w/n which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal w/outfurther notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW)
02/23/2011ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
02/23/2011DISMISSED
11/14/2011FiledMandate
04/19/2013FiledChange Of Address Received From Raymond Dodd (Appellant)