judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DIX (PAUL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34691
Short Caption:DIX (PAUL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C121200Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/24/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/19/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07737
10/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34688, 34691, 34693, 34706, 34715, 34716, 34738. 99-09623
01/24/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. Mailed on 01/20/00. 00-01106
01/24/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/31/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-12929
08/28/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-13040
08/28/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/17/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 10, 2001. 01-13040