judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

RUSSELL SETH MYERS v. NORMA RUTH MYERS

Case: B-4429
B-4429
01/22/1974
Application for Writ of Error
RUSSELL SETH MYERS
NORMA RUTH MYERS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/10/1974Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/25/1974Supplement to ResponseRespondent
02/13/1974Response to PetitionRespondent
01/22/1974Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/12/1974Response to Motion filed
04/10/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/25/1974Supplement to Response
02/25/1974Response to Motion filed
02/20/1974Motion to Strike filed
02/13/1974Response to Petition
01/22/1974Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/22/1974Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Norma Ruth MyersRespondent
Russell Seth MyersPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information