judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

PLAINS GROWERS, INC. v. HON. E. E. JORDAN, DISTRICT JUDGE, ET AL.

Case: B-4449
B-4449
02/04/1974
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
PLAINS GROWERS, INC.
HON. E. E. JORDAN, DISTRICT JUDGE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/11/1974Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
12/09/1974Supplement to Motion for RehearingRelator
12/06/1974Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
12/04/1974Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
11/14/1974Motion for RehearingRelator
04/26/1974Response to Brief filedRespondent
04/19/1974Post submission brief filedRelator
03/28/1974Reply to ResponseRelator
02/19/1974Response to Brief filedRespondent
02/19/1974Response to PetitionRespondent
02/04/1974Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
02/04/1974Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/18/1974Opinion issued on motion for rehearing
12/16/1974Response to Motion filed
12/11/1974Adopt by Reference pursuant to Tex. R. App. P. 9.7
12/11/1974Amicus Curiae Brief received
12/11/1974Motion for leave to file brief
12/09/1974Supplement to Motion for Rehearing
12/06/1974Amicus Curiae Brief received
12/04/1974Exhibits in case/cause filed
11/27/1974Letter Filed
11/21/1974Response to Motion filed
11/14/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/07/1974Motion for leave to file brief
10/30/1974Dissenting opinion issued.
10/30/1974Opinion issued
04/26/1974Response to Brief filed
04/19/1974Post submission brief filed
03/28/1974Reply to Response
02/19/1974Response to Brief filed
02/19/1974Response to Petition
02/05/1974Bond
02/04/1974Order of the Court Issued
02/04/1974Brief in Support of Petition
02/04/1974Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
02/04/1974Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hon. E. E. Jordan, District Judge, et al.Respondent
Charles B. GuyAmicus Curiae
Cowsert, Bybee, Line and HoelscherAmicus Curiae
Plains Growers, Inc.Relator
Dallas Bar Association and Fort Worth-Tarrant County Bar AssociationAmicus Curiae
Persons and SeljosAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information