Case: B-4420
B-4420
01/17/1974
Application for Writ of Error
GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
BOYD MULLEN CHEVROLET, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/09/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
02/18/1974 | Response to Brief filed | Respondent | | |
02/04/1974 | Letter brief | Petitioner | | |
01/30/1974 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
01/17/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/15/1974 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
04/09/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
02/18/1974 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
02/07/1974 | Supplement or amendment to application. | | ||
02/04/1974 | Letter brief | | ||
01/30/1974 | Response to Petition | | ||
01/17/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
01/17/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Boyd Mullen Chevrolet, Inc. | Respondent | |
General Motors Corporation | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information