Case: B-4711
B-4711
02/07/1974
Direct Appeal
CONLEN GRAIN AND MERCANTLE, INC. AND J. E. CRABTREE
TEXAS GRAIN SORGHUM PRODUCERS BOARD
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/03/1975 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
02/18/1975 | Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed | | ||
02/17/1975 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
02/10/1975 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
02/06/1975 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
02/05/1975 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
01/29/1975 | Motion for Rehearing | | ||
10/02/1974 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
09/10/1974 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
09/03/1974 | Post submission brief filed | | ||
07/26/1974 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
07/08/1974 | Appellees' Brief filed | | ||
06/14/1974 | Direct Appeal filed | | ||
02/07/1974 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/03/1975 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
02/18/1975 | Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed | | ||
02/17/1975 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
02/17/1975 | Letter Filed | | ||
02/11/1975 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
02/10/1975 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
02/06/1975 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
02/05/1975 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
02/05/1975 | Motion for leave to file brief | | ||
01/31/1975 | Letter Filed | | ||
01/30/1975 | Motion for Extension of Time filed | Filing granted | | |
01/29/1975 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
01/15/1975 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
01/15/1975 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
01/15/1975 | Opinion issued | | ||
10/02/1974 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
09/10/1974 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
09/03/1974 | Post submission brief filed | | ||
07/30/1974 | Addendum to brief filed | | ||
07/26/1974 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
07/08/1974 | Appellees' Brief filed | | ||
06/14/1974 | Direct Appeal filed | | ||
06/14/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/14/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/14/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/07/1974 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Texas Wheat Producers Association | Amicus Curiae | |
Texas Peanut Producers Board, Southwestern Peanut Growers Association and Birdsong Peanut Company | Amicus Curiae | |
Texas Grain Sorghum Producers Board | Appellee | |
Texas Pork Producers Board | Amicus Curiae | |
Texas Peanut Producers Board | Amicus Curiae | |
Conlen Grain and Mercantle, Inc. and J. E. Crabtree | Appellant | |
Texas Pecan Producers Board | Amicus Curiae | |
Texas Soybean Association | Amicus Curiae | |
Texas Association of Cotton Producer Organizations | Amicus Curiae | |
Texas Turkey Producers Board | Amicus Curiae |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information