Case: B-4440
B-4440
01/29/1974
Application for Writ of Error
CLARISSA CROCKER, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE OF GLENN E. CROCKER, DECEASED
WINTHROP LABORATORIES, DIVISION OF STERLING DRUG, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/17/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
06/07/1974 | Letter brief | Petitioner | | |
06/04/1974 | Letter brief | Respondent | | |
02/06/1974 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
01/29/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/22/1974 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
10/17/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
10/02/1974 | Opinion issued | | ||
06/07/1974 | Letter brief | | ||
06/04/1974 | Letter brief | | ||
04/24/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
04/24/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
04/24/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
04/24/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
04/24/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/06/1974 | Response to Petition | | ||
01/29/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
01/29/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Clarissa Crocker, individually and on Behalf of the Estate of Glenn E. Crocker, deceased | Petitioner | |
Winthrop Laboratories, Division of Sterling Drug, Inc. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information