Case: PD-0342-84
PD-0342-84
03/19/1984
PDR Case Type
SPRINGSTON, PATRICK NEAL
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/27/1984 | BRIEF FILED | Appellant | |
11/28/1984 | BRIEF FILED | State | |
04/19/1984 | RESPONSE FILED | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/03/1988 | MANDATE ISSD | | |
05/18/1988 | OPINION ISSD | Reversed COA; Remanded COA | |
01/09/1985 | SET FOR SUBMIS | | |
12/27/1984 | BRIEF FILED | | |
11/28/1984 | BRIEF FILED | | |
10/24/1984 | PDR DISP | Granted | |
10/24/1984 | PDR DISP | Granted | |
07/20/1984 | 4404H BAIL | Granted | |
07/20/1984 | 4404H BAIL FILED | | |
04/19/1984 | RESPONSE FILED | | |
03/19/1984 | PDR FILED | | |
02/13/1984 | SUB BRIEFS & ARGT | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/03/1988 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
SPRINGSTON, PATRICK NEAL | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Vincent W. Perini |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | Robert A. Huttash John C. Vance |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-82-01013-CR
Rev Rem
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
194th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Ed Kinkeade
F81-12235-M