judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: EVAN M. SLAVITT

Case Information: 10-BG-0730
Short Caption:IN RE: EVAN M. SLAVITTClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Reciprocal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN214-10Filed Date:06/17/2010

Opening Event Date:06/17/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
William R. RossNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentEvan M. Slavitt NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/17/2010DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of an order of the Supreme Judicial Court for the Commonwealth of Massachusetts suspending respondent for two months. Respondent is an inactive member of the DC Bar.
06/24/2010RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION to Bar Counsel's proposed order and in the alternative, motion to show cause.
07/06/2010PETITIONER'S REPLY to respondent's opposition to proposed order.
07/16/2010TMC - notice to the court & request for suspension & OTSC - response (SLAVITT) - response (BAR COUNSEL) - proposed published order
09/23/2010FiledSUSPENSION ORDERED that Evan M. Slavitt is hereby suspended for a period of two months. Respondent has failed to establish the existence of any exceptions under D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 11 (c) and may not re-litigate the factual basis for his discipline in another jurisdiction. In re Fuchs, 905 A.2d 160 (D.C. 2006). It is FURTHER ORDERED that for purposes of reinstatement respondent's suspension will not begin to run until he files an affidavit that fully complies with the requirements of D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g). (FI, TH, NW)
09/29/2010AFFIDAVIT of respondent Sec 14 (g)