judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THOMAS WITOWSKI v. GAYLE (WITOWSKI) ROOSEVELT

Case Heading (06-141)
Case Number:06-141Case Docketed On:06/22/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:THOMAS WITOWSKI v. GAYLE (WITOWSKI) ROOSEVELT
Full Title:THOMAS WITOWSKI, Appellant (Defendant), v. GAYLE (WITOWSKI) ROOSEVELT, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantThomas WitowskiRobert E. Schroth Sr.
AppelleeGayle RooseveltDavid G. Lewis

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 70
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/22/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/22/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/22/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/22/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/07/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant (faxed)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/07/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/08/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant (original)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/08/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/25/2006Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/03/2006Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/13/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief, appellant replyMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/13/2006Order - Denying appellant's request for extension to file reply briefOrderDenyFinal
11/13/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/15/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/16/2006Event - Phone Call from district court clerk re record request. Clerk is gone until after Thanksgiving. Instructed delay in sending record is okay because the court will be moving.EventPhone CallFinal
12/01/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/01/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/27/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order dismissing. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/15/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/15/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/15/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal