judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SIMLER VS. SIMLER

Case Information: 34690
Short Caption:SIMLER VS. SIMLERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D131726Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/31/1999 / Holland Johnson, SusanSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/19/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from John R. Lusk--check no. 1076.
08/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07736
08/31/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Susan Holland Johnson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/02/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-10684
11/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 99-11529
12/10/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-12430
12/10/1999Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 99-12431
01/14/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NNP/CLK 00-00633
01/14/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.