judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-151
A-151
04/20/1944
Application for Writ of Error
J. L. JOSEPH, ET AL.
JESSE JAMES, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/14/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
08/28/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
06/22/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/20/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/10/1945Letter Filed
02/14/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/26/1944Bond
10/18/1944Document received (See Remarks)
08/28/1944Brief in Support of Petition
06/22/1944Motion for RehearingFiling granted
04/20/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
04/20/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jesse James, et al.Respondent
J. L. Joseph, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information