Case Information: 39180 | |||
Short Caption: | MGM GRAND HOTEL VS. DIST. CT. (CRAWFORD) C/W 39353 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 39180*, 39353 | Related Case(s): | 35533 , 35572 , 35601 , 39353 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A383711 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Maupin | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/12/2002 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
02/12/2002 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. | 02-02748 | |
02/12/2002 | Petition/Writ | Filed Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Writ. | 02-02751 | |
02/12/2002 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Appendix of Petitioner MGM Grand Hotel, Inc., Vols. 1 and 2. | 02-02754 | |
02/12/2002 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Certification of Service of Petition for Writ of Mandamus and/or Prohibition, Memorandum of Points and Authority in Support of MGM Grand Hotel, Inc.'s Petition for Writ of Mandamus and/or Prohibition and Appendix of Petitioner, MGM Grand Hotel, Inc. | 02-02755 | |
02/13/2002 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Maupin. Law firm of Kravitz Schnitzer & Sloane, Chtd. | ||
02/13/2002 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Kravitz firm - check no. 039918. | ||
02/25/2002 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata. Errata to Memorandum of Points and Authority in Support of MGM Grand Hotel, Inc., Petition for Writ of Mandamus and/or Prohibition. | 02-03506 | |
03/04/2002 | Other | Other. Filed Harris Production Services' Joinder in MGM Grand Hotel, Inc.'s Petition for Writ of Mandamus and/or Prohibition. | 02-03926 | |
03/19/2002 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate. Harris Production Services' Motion to Consolidate Pursuant to NRCP 1 and NRCP 42(a). Nos. 39180/39353. | 02-04926 | |
04/04/2002 | Motion | Filed Motion. Joinder to Harris Production Services Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 39180 and 39353. | 02-06020 | |
04/24/2002 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Petition. Stipulation to Dismiss MGM's Petition for Writ of Mandamus and/or Prohibition. | 02-07288 | |
05/08/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Petition. Order Consolidating and Dismissing Petitions for Writs of Mandamus or Prohibition. We grant petitioners' motion to consolidate the petitions. Petitioners and the real party in interest have stipulated that these writ petitions should be dismissed because the matter is moot. Based on the parties' stipulations, ' . . . we hereby dismiss these consolidated petitions for writs of mandamus or prohibition.' Nos. 39180/39353. | 02-08049 | |
05/08/2002 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No notice in lieu of remittitur issued. Nos. 39180/39353. |