judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BURGESS VS. STOREY COUNTY BD. OF COMMR'S

Case Information: 32634
Short Caption:BURGESS VS. STOREY COUNTY BD. OF COMMR'SCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Storey Co. - First Judicial District - CV19345Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/09/1998 / Gruesen, ThomasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:10/11/1999 at 9:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:10/11/1999How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/30/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Roderic Carucci-check no. 3985.
06/30/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant).
06/30/1998Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (Received on 6/19/98 before case was docketed).
07/09/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas W. Gruesen, Sr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/22/1998Docketing StatementReceived Docketing Statement.
07/23/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.
07/24/1998Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The docketing statement provisionally submitted on July 22, 1998, shall be filed, forthwith.
07/24/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
08/21/1998Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
09/01/1998Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Accordingly, appellant shall have 70 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
11/05/1998BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 11/5/98.
11/05/1998AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief.
12/02/1998MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: January 6, 1999.
01/05/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Second Extension of Time in which to file Respondent's Answering Brief.
01/07/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The respondent's answering brief shall be served and filed on or before January 20, 1999.
01/19/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Third Extension of Time in which to file Respondent's Answering Brief.
01/21/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The respondent's answering brief shall be served and filed on or before February 3, 1999.
02/03/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 2/3/99.
02/10/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 2/10/99.
07/06/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Roderic A. Carucci with Terry Thomas as co-counsel for appellants.
08/11/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for October 13, 1999 at the hour of 9:30 a.m.- 1/2 hr. in Carson City. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML
08/25/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Rescheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is rescheduled for October 11, 1999 at the hour of 9:30 a.m.- 1/2 hr. in Carson City. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML
09/27/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
10/11/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Oral Argument before the Northern Nevada Panel this day: submitted. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML
02/02/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Reversed and remanded with instructions." Before Young, Agosti and Leavitt, JJ. Per Curiam. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 12. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 01-04647
02/22/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. RETURNED check no. 34619 ($100) to Storey County District Attorney.
02/22/2000Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. 00-02788
03/23/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[We deny respondents' request that we not publish our opinion in this case. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-04710
04/10/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-05643
04/10/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/14/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 11, 2000. 00-05643