judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SOL SALINS INC. SURE WAY REFRIGERATED TRUCK

Case Information: 84-CV-0967
Short Caption:SOL SALINS INC. SURE WAY REFRIGERATED TRUCKClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA3240-83Filed Date:07/18/1984

Opening Event Date:07/18/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/06/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/15/1985
Argued/Submitted:11/19/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Howard B. Silberberg YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John S. Burson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SOL SALINS INC. SURE WAY REFRIGERATED TRUCK TRANSPORTATION BROKERS INC.
07/18/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/06/1984FiledRecord Completed
03/15/1985FiledBriefing Completed
11/19/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/11/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition