Case: B-3140
B-3140
04/12/1971
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
JOHN P. SPENCER
STATE OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/25/1972 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Relator | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/25/1972 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | | ||
01/10/1972 | Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus | Overruled | | |
12/13/1971 | Letter Filed | | ||
11/15/1971 | Letter Filed | | ||
08/30/1971 | Miscellaneous Motion | | ||
04/12/1971 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State of Texas | Respondent | |
John P. Spencer | Relator |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information