Case: 05-00-01518-CV
05-00-01518-CV
09/19/2000
Interloctory
Halsey, Sandra
Dallas County
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/25/2002 | Mandate Issued | | |
10/24/2002 | Opinion issued | Reversed & Remanded to Tr. Ct. | |
03/21/2002 | Petition for Review Filed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/08/2002 | 25.00 Shipping Fee Paid | | |
12/14/2001 | Record Shipped | | |
12/10/2001 | Original proceeding filing fee due | | |
12/07/2001 | Brief Due | | |
10/15/2001 | Response due | | |
08/27/2001 | Petition for Review Filed | | |
08/01/2001 | Opinion to Publishers | | |
07/10/2001 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
06/14/2001 | 10.00 Fee Due | | |
06/14/2001 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
05/30/2001 | Opinion issued | Reversed & Rendered | |
05/30/2001 | Record Retention | Destroy | |
05/30/2001 | Opinion issued | Reversed & Rendered | |
03/13/2001 | Submitted | | |
03/13/2001 | Submission | | |
03/13/2001 | Submitted | | |
03/05/2001 | Notice received | | |
01/02/2001 | Letter Filed | | |
12/21/2000 | Submission | | |
11/29/2000 | Brief Due | | |
11/29/2000 | Case ready to be set | | |
11/29/2000 | Case ready to be set | | |
11/28/2000 | Brief Filed | | |
11/09/2000 | Brief Filed | | |
11/09/2000 | Record Returned | | |
11/08/2000 | Brief Due | | |
11/07/2000 | Record Checked Out | | |
10/24/2000 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/23/2000 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
10/23/2000 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |
10/23/2000 | Brief Due | | |
10/09/2000 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
10/09/2000 | No Reporter's Record will be Filed | | |
10/03/2000 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
10/02/2000 | Notice to Party's that Clerk's Record Not Paid | | |
09/29/2000 | Record due | | |
09/29/2000 | 125.00 Filing Fee Paid | | |
09/25/2000 | 125.00 Filing Fee Due | | |
09/25/2000 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |
09/19/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
09/19/2000 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
08/31/2000 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/25/2002 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Sandra Halsey | Appellant | Cynthia Mccrann Wheless Raymond G. Wheless |
Dallas County | Appellee | Moira A. Parro John Clark Long, Iv |
Trial Court Information
68th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Gary Hall
99-09032-C