Case Information: 85-CV-1456 | |||
Short Caption: | AKINS, MARK DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CA3328-85 | Filed Date: | 10/25/1985 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 10/25/1985 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 04/21/1986 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 10/23/1986 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 03/24/1987 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Mark Akins | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellant | John Doe | N | |||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | AKINS, MARK DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA ET AL | |||
01/01/1906 | TRUITTM for: IBM ROBLER PRO HAC VICE | |||
10/25/1985 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
04/21/1986 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
10/23/1986 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
03/24/1987 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
03/31/1987 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |