judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COLE (REGGIE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32270
Short Caption:COLE (REGGIE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 51506
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C130340Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/21/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/01/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/01/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
06/02/1998Other Other. Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." 1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.]
06/12/1998Other Other. Received proper person Petition for Rehearing. (Received original and two copies).
07/07/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On June 12, 1998, appellant submitted a proper person petition for rehearing. Fn1[The clerk of this court shall file the petition received in this court on June 12, 1998.] Appellant contends that his notice of appeal should be deemed timely filed. We hereby direct the attorney general to obtain and transmit to the clerk of this court, within 30 days from the date of this order, certified copies of any available prison records indicating the actual date upon which appellant delivered his notice of appeal to a prison official. If the prison records do not indicate that appellant delivered his notice of appeal to a prison official, the attorney general shall so inform this court. We defer ruling on appellant's petition for rehearing pending receipt of and consideration of a response from the attorney general.
07/07/1998Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Petition for Rehearing. (per 7/7/98 order).
08/04/1998MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause.
09/30/1998Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Granted. Reinstating Appeal, and Directing Transmission of the Record. On August 4, 1998, the attorney general filed a response to our order of July 7, 1998. We conclude that appellant's notice of appeal was timely filed. We grant appellant's petition for rehearing, and we reinstate this appeal. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to this court a certified copy of the complete trial record of this appeal, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. Fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.]
12/21/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2.
12/21/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/25/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that the district court did not err and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-16876
10/23/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-17003
10/23/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 1, 2000. 00-17003