judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WALTER R. KAWULOK and HELEN C. KAWULOK, husband and wife v. ROMAN J. LEGERSKI, JR.

Case Heading (06-281)
Case Number:06-281Case Docketed On:12/08/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:WALTER R. KAWULOK and HELEN C. KAWULOK, husband and wife v. ROMAN J. LEGERSKI, JR.
Full Title:WALTER R. KAWULOK and HELEN C. KAWULOK, husband and wife, Appellant (Plaintiffs), v. ROMAN J. LEGERSKI, JR., Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWalter R. KawulokHayden F. Heaphy Jr.
Alison Ochs Gee
AppellantHelen C. KawulokHayden F. Heaphy Jr.
Alison Ochs Gee
AppelleeRoman J. Legerski Jr.Stuart S. Healy

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 133
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/08/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/08/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/08/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/08/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/14/2006Notice-Incoming - Other - received copy of stipulated motion for stay pending appeal under W.R.C.P. 62(d) and motion to set supersedeas bond under W.R.A.P. 402 filed in district courtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
01/24/2007Brief - Appellant; appendix to brief of appellants; and statement of costs of original transcript; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
03/06/2007Brief - Appellee; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
03/19/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/20/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/23/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes: Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcript; Volume III, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
04/23/2007Order - Other - Emergency order allowing four justices to hear oral argument (Justice Golden ill).OrderOtherFinal
04/26/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Hayden F. Heaphy, Jr. and Alison A. Ochs, argument by Ms. Ochs for appellants; Stuart S. Healy for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/26/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/17/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order, reversing. Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/05/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/05/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/07/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 9/6/07 by Roger D. Calkins.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal