judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TUTEN, MELVIN E. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0467
Short Caption:TUTEN, MELVIN E. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Arson
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7081-79Filed Date:03/26/1981

Opening Event Date:03/26/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/27/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/22/1982
Argued/Submitted:02/28/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TUTEN, MELVIN E. UNITED STATES
03/26/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/27/1981FiledRecord Completed
12/22/1982FiledBriefing Completed
02/28/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/30/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition