judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

REX C. REDMAN AND J. R. REDMAN, TEXAS COMPANY, ET AL. v. GEORGE W. GRANT

Case: A-182
A-182
05/16/1944
Application for Writ of Error
REX C. REDMAN AND J. R. REDMAN, TEXAS COMPANY, ET AL.
GEORGE W. GRANT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/09/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/08/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/29/1944Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/26/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
05/16/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/16/1944Motion to Withdraw Filed
12/11/1944Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs
11/09/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/08/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/31/1944Document received (See Remarks)
05/31/1944Document received (See Remarks)
05/29/1944Reply to Response
05/26/1944Response to Petition
05/16/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/16/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
George W. GrantRespondent
Texas Company, et al.Petitioner
Rex C. Redman and J. R. RedmanPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information