Case: A-10063
A-10063
03/20/1964
Application for Writ of Error
CENTRAL STATES LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
MRS. MARGARET M. BYRNES
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/04/1964 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
04/30/1964 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
04/30/1964 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
04/06/1964 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
03/20/1964 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/04/1964 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
05/01/1964 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
04/30/1964 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
04/30/1964 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
04/06/1964 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
03/20/1964 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
03/20/1964 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mrs. Margaret M. Byrnes | Respondent | |
Harry F. Thornberry | Amicus Curiae | |
Thomas G. Nash, Jr. | Amicus Curiae | |
Central States Life Insurance Company | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information