Case Information: 39191 | |||
Short Caption: | CORSE VS. CLARK COUNTY | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A441484 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/27/2002 / Kunin, Israel | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/14/2002 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Dennis A Kist & Associates--check no. 10029. | ||
02/14/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 02-02938 | |
02/27/2002 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
02/27/2002 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 02-03624 | |
03/06/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Israel Kunin. (Docketing statement) | ||
05/06/2002 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 21, 2002. | 02-07943 | |
05/24/2002 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 02-09222 | |
06/04/2002 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the time deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 02-09753 | |
06/18/2002 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 02-10528 | |
09/30/2002 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 02-16814 | |
10/15/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK | 02-17788 | |
10/15/2002 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |