Case Information: 39196 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO DONALD | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0102651 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/22/2002 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/15/2002 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
02/15/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 02-03068 | |
03/25/2002 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. from appellant Albert L. Donald. | ||
03/25/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Appellant Albert L. Donald) | 02-05201 | |
03/25/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. (Appellant Albert L. Donald) Due Date: 10 days | ||
04/02/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Orders granting motions (2) filed 3/7/02. Due Date: 10 days | ||
04/03/2002 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Albert L. Donald--Nevada Department of Corrections check no. 106409. | ||
04/05/2002 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copies of two orders filed in district court on March 7, 2002. | 02-06108 | |
04/17/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn2[NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings).] fn3[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] | 02-06825 | |
04/22/2002 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. | 02-07053 | |
04/22/2002 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
05/16/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn6[We note that the district court did not abuse its discretion when it denied Brenda's motion for the appointment of counsel on appeal. Although appellants were not granted leave to file papers in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have considered the proper person documents received from them.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB | 02-08601 | |
06/11/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Record on Appeal returned this day. | 02-08705 | |
06/11/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/17/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 13, 2002. | 02-08705 |