Case Information: 85-CV-1532 | |||
Short Caption: | SIMMS, JOE B. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CA6693-85 | Filed Date: | 11/01/1985 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 11/01/1985 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 03/02/1989 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | SIMMS, JOE B. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA | |||
11/01/1985 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
11/15/1985 | CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/15/1985 | $50.00 DOCKETING FEE PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/03/1985 | $5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/10/1985 | MEMORANDUM NO 7A...DESIGNATION/STATEMENT/ DUE DECEMBER 24th PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/23/1985 | DESIGNATION OF RECORD & SRT MLH PANEL SCDATE 122485 SCHPRD DR | |||
01/08/1986 | RECORD ON APPEAL RTC PB PANEL SCDATE 123185 SCHPRD R | |||
11/14/1988 | ORDER APLT BR DUE IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 020586 SCHPRD RT | |||
01/18/1989 | ORDER APLT BR DUE IN 10 DAYS OR DISMISS. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 122788 SCHPRD BA | |||
02/07/1989 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition | ||
02/07/1989 | ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE BA. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/07/1989 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE | |||
03/02/1989 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |