Case Information: 34170 | |||
Short Caption: | RIOS (LEOPOLDO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR982402 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/07/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/07/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-03695 | |
05/17/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Response due: 20 days from the date of this order. | 99-04011 | |
06/01/1999 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 99-04487 | |
06/11/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Fast Track. On June 1, 1999, counsel for appellant filed a response to our order of May 17, 1999. We conclude that we have jurisdiction over this appeal. Transcript request form or certificate that no transcript is required due: 10 days. Fast track statement due: 40 days. | 99-05011 | |
06/21/1999 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Certificate of Non-request for Rough Draft Transcript and Accompanying certified Copy of Transcript of Sentencing Proceedings. | 99-05380 | |
07/21/1999 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 99-06549 | |
07/21/1999 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 99-06550 | |
08/10/1999 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 99-07364 | |
09/24/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | 99-09132 | |
10/20/1999 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 99-10219 | |
10/20/1999 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/28/1999 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 26, 1999. | 99-10219 |