judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-2671
B-2671
04/12/1971
Application for Writ of Error
ALBERT H. POLLAND, INDEPENDENT EXECUTOR
AMERICAN HOSPITAL AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/30/1971Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/20/1971Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/23/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
04/27/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/30/1971Motion for Rehearing
10/20/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/06/1971Opinion issued
06/23/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/23/1971Document received (See Remarks)
06/23/1971Document received (See Remarks)
06/23/1971Document received (See Remarks)
06/23/1971Document received (See Remarks)
04/27/1971Response to Petition
04/12/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
American Hospital and Life Insurance CompanyRespondent
Albert H. Polland, Independent ExecutorPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information