judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WHEAT (RICK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34712
Short Caption:WHEAT (RICK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9900449CClassification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/24/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/24/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-07886
08/27/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Jury Trial--June 30, 1999 (rough draft); Testimony of Dawn Colleli--June 30, 1999; Jury Trial--July 1, 1999; Jury Trial--July 1, 1999 (rough draft). Court Reporter: Julietta Forbes. 99-08049
09/21/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due: to and including September 27, 1999. 99-08947
09/24/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-09166
09/24/1999AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 99-09167
10/07/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-09683
05/10/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-07738
06/06/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-09488
06/06/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/12/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 7, 2000.-- 00-09488