judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PETER DESILVA,ETAL V. NAT'L CAPITAL REVITALIZATION CORP,ETAL

Case Information: 10-CV-0752
Short Caption:PETER DESILVA,ETAL V. NAT'L CAPITAL REVITALIZATION CORP,ETALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Property
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAE5336-05Filed Date:06/13/2010

Opening Event Date:06/13/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/04/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPeter Desilva N
Elaine J. Mittleman NN
AppellantRose Rumber N
Elaine J. Mittleman NN
AppellantJoseph Rumber N
Elaine J. Mittleman NN
AppelleeNational Capital Revitalization CorporationN
William D. Burk NN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/13/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/20/2010 ORDERED that appellants shall, W/N 20 DAYS From the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been PREMATURELY FILED. See DC Code 11-721... (BY: ETW)
07/20/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
08/05/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
08/19/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to file opposition IS DENIED. It is *****MORE*****
08/19/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPEAL NO. 10CV752 IS HEREBY DISMISSED as having been PREMATURELY FILED. In Re Estate of Chuong, 623 A.2d 1154, 1157 (1993) (en banc). It is *****MORE*****
08/19/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE THESE APPEALS IS DENIED AS MOOT. It is *****MORE*****
08/19/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IN APPEAL NO. 09CV895 IS GRANTED. It is *****MORE*****
08/19/2010DISMISSED
09/02/2010APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING
09/22/2010ORDER that appellees, within 14 days from the date of this order, shall file a response to pet for rehearing. (WH)
10/06/2010APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE to petition for rehearing
10/26/2010ORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING (KR,BR,KG)
11/04/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/18/2014FiledArchived
09/03/2019LodgedRecord Copies