judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROSS VS. ORRISON

Case Information: 34711
Short Caption:ROSS VS. ORRISONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 21385Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/16/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/24/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from David L. Ross--check no. 269.
08/24/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07888
09/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-08326
09/16/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. 99-08763
09/16/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/12/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having reviewed the record on appeal, and concluding that there was no reversible error, " . . . we affirm the judgment of the district court." SNP00A-WM/ML/NB 00-18038
11/07/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-18199
11/07/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 8, 2000. 00-18199