judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CAROL L. VROMAN v. TOWN & COUNTRY CREDIT CORP.

Case Heading (06-170)
Case Number:06-170Case Docketed On:07/19/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:CAROL L. VROMAN v. TOWN & COUNTRY CREDIT CORP.
Full Title:CAROL L. VROMAN, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. TOWN & COUNTRY CREDIT CORP., Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCarol L. VromanWilliam D. Bagley
AppelleeTown & Country Credit Corp.Dale W. Cottam
Billie LM Addleman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 82
Citation:158 P.3d 141

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/19/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/19/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/19/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/19/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/21/2006Motion - Dismiss party, all appellees except Town & Country Credit Corp.MotionDismiss partyFinal
09/01/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
09/06/2006Order - Dismissing party, all appellees except Town & Country Credit Corp., caption amended to reflect dismissalOrderDismissing partyFinal
09/07/2006Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
09/13/2006Response/Objection - Motion to dismiss appealResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
09/14/2006Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from appellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
09/26/2006Order - Deny motion to dismiss and order sanctioning counsel for improper designation of recordOrderDenyFinal
10/05/2006Fees - Sanctions received - designation and copy of proper designationFeesSanctions received - designationFinal
10/18/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
11/06/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/06/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/16/2006Event - Phone Call from Diane at Clerk of District Court Clerk's Office; she is missing a designated document and has requested it from counsel. Will bring record as soon as document is receivedEventPhone CallFinal
11/20/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal; eight volumes. Volumes I - VI, Original Papers; Volume VII, Transcripts; Volume VIII, ExhibitsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/20/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/14/2006Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (William D. Bagley for appellant; Billie L. Addleman for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/14/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/15/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part and remanding. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/31/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/31/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/31/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal