Case: 02-03-00107-CV
02-03-00107-CV
04/16/2003
Probate
Carmen Borth, Individually and on behalf of the Estate of Blake Borth, Deceased, and as Next Friend of Tarl Borth, Elizabeth Borth, and Richard Borth, Minor Children
Charley's Concrete Company, Inc. and Chris L. Gullett
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/03/2005 | Mandate Issued | | |||||
12/29/2004 | Order Entered | | |||||
11/12/2004 | Petition for Review Disposed in Higher Court | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||
09/08/2004 | Petition for Review Filed in Supreme Court | | |||||
08/12/2004 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||
07/30/2004 | Mo. for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
07/30/2004 | Mo. for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review | | |||||
07/09/2004 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |||||
06/24/2004 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||
06/07/2004 | Notice from Lead Counsel | | |||||
06/07/2004 | Motion for Extension for Rehearing Disposed | Item is Moot | | ||||
06/04/2004 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |||||
06/02/2004 | Motion for Extension for Rehearing Filed | | |||||
05/20/2004 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded |
| ||||
12/02/2003 | Submitted | | |||||
10/20/2003 | Submission | | |||||
10/20/2003 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
10/20/2003 | Brief Filed | | |||||
09/02/2003 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
08/29/2003 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |||||
08/19/2003 | Brief Filed | | |||||
07/17/2003 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
07/17/2003 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |||||
06/18/2003 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
06/18/2003 | Request for Extension of Clerk's Record | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
06/17/2003 | Received Clerk's Affidavit or Letter | | |||||
06/02/2003 | Proof of Payment and or Designation to tc clerk or court reporter | | |||||
05/19/2003 | Correspondence from interested entity | | |||||
05/19/2003 | Clerk's Record Not Received | | |||||
04/16/2003 | No reporter's record will be filed | | |||||
04/16/2003 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||||
04/16/2003 | Appellant's Notice of Appeal | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/03/2005 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Borth, Carmen, Indiv. and on behalf of Estate of Blake Borth, Deceased, and as n/f | Appellant | J. Mark Sudderth |
Charley's Concrete Company, Inc. | Appellee | Oscar Rey Rodriguez W. Blake Hyde |
Gullett, Chris L. | Appellee | W. Blake Hyde |
Trial Court Information
236th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Thomas Wilson Lowe,
236-189189-01