Case: A-10906
A-10906
07/05/1965
Application for Writ of Error
MARIE BJORGO
DONALD BJORGO
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/25/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
07/12/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
07/05/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/25/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
04/13/1966 | Opinion issued | | ||
12/01/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
07/12/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
07/05/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
07/05/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Donald Bjorgo | Respondent | |
Marie Bjorgo | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information