Case: A-10899
A-10899
07/02/1965
Application for Writ of Error
NEWSOM TRUCK LINES, INC.
BIRMINGHAM FIRE INSURANCE LINES, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/20/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
07/13/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
07/02/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/20/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
10/06/1965 | Opinion issued | | ||
07/23/1965 | Letter Filed | | ||
07/13/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
07/02/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
07/02/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Newsom Truck Lines, Inc. | Petitioner | |
Birmingham Fire Insurance Lines, Inc. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information